Governing document CHRISTIAN SCIENCE VISITING NURSE SERVICE , LONDON FIELD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1954 AND SCHEME OF 25 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1981 AND REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 25 JULY 2005, 20 JULY 2006 AND 13TH DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS WHO ARE CHRISTIAN SCIENTISTS RESIDENT IN GREATER LONDON AND IN SPECIAL CASES THE COUNTIES ADJOINING GREATER LONDON AND WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.