Governing document THE KATHERINE MARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON THE 8 SEPTEMBER 1959, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 JULY 1995, TRUSTEES' MEETING OF 14 MAY 1996, AND ORDER DATED 20 DECEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2016 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO DIVIDE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AMONGST THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS NAMELY: 1) BARNARDOS. 2) THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN. 3) THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY OF ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.