Trustees CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH ROYAL ARMY PAY CORPS
Charity number: 270477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Alan Brown | Chair | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Michael Theodore Burton-Doe FCMA CGMA | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Colonel Victoria Jane Whiting ADC | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL ALAN MCTAGGART FCMA, CGMA | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED JONATHAN WARD | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Lt Col R A ROSENHEAD MBE FCG | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
LT COL RICHARD WARD | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hawkins | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Roden | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BONWICK | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK O'CALLAGHAN | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LT COL IAN PENDLEBERY | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|||||
MICK COTTON | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.