Trustees MALDON WYCKE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 294223
Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Tiffin | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Copley | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Elliott | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Palmer | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE LETT | Trustee | 17 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Church | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jean Healey | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.