Trustees FELTONFLEET SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 312070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES DOUGLAS ASHBEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Darryl Harrington | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priya Barai | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Quincey | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary White | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HUMPHREY | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ST GALLAY | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HOWARD | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY JENNER MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.