Trustees WORCESTER OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1091564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MICHAEL ASTLES | Chair | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abbi Jakeman | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Gilhooly | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Brown | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsay Berryman | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Paul Field | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hooper | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Hasnip | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Price | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Turner | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS HOLLOWAY BA QTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.