Trustees TOWNSEND YOUTH PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1093213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Dobbins | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Bruce Viney | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Thomas Southgate | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Elaine Cowley | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Petrauskas | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Simonm Potterton | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Elms | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
BOURNEMOUTH YMCA | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
COLIN HARTLAND | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 September 2009 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.