Trustees LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY
Charity number: 1120102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart McLeod | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Oldroyd | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hogston | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Msgr Paul Grogan | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Patrick O'Connor | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Joseph Sharma | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Angelo Bentley | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roland Dumisani Maposa | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Denis Kobzev | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tara Jane Smith | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Nursaw | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Kelsey Howard-Matthews | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Absha Milnes | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
William McCarthy | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charles Odita Egbu | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Celestia Ford-Escobar | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Christine Patricia Reed | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE HANLEY | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Anthony Joseph Holden | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Right Reverend Marcus Stock | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Christine Rix | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.