Trustees EALING STREET PASTORS INITIATIVE
Charity number: 1137316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Alan Broadbent | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
John Michael Quinn | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Samantha Jane Williams | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Clifford | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
Rev Andrew Russell Corsie | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD WARD | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
THE REVD YOUNG EUN PARK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.