Register of Charities - The Charity Commission MANOR COURT BAPTIST CHURCH NUNEATON
Charity number: 1186226-1
Linked charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAY 2009. as amended on 26 Sep 2019 as amended on 17 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Registration history
- 19 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.