Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES, PORCHESTER
Charity number: 1128977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Murden | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Micheal Forsyth | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Atkin | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Drury | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jill Davison | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Oliver | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Harrison | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Mary Lucas | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Wallis | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MURIEl WEISZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE CHILDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.