Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KNAPHILL WITH BROOKWOOD
Charity number: 1128410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Neil James Hopkins | Chair | 07 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Dawn Lucas-Brown | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tyas | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Parsons | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Margaret Gale | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nicola Moses | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Veness | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Mary Webster | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Anne Tisdall OBE | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Wayne Jonathan Halls | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lee Grieve | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon Robert Darley | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca White | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BAILEY | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Christina Joanne Hunt | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JULIE LEVETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.