Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOURS IFORD (WINCHESTER)
Charity number: 1130676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Anne Woodings | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Quentin Dale | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Alan Pollard | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Elizabeth Mayne | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Charles William Woodings | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Ivy Gatehouse | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jeremy Douglas Ferguson | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Richards | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Bev Collum-Mills | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JANET IRENE MOORE | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Moyes | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|||||||
CLAIRE LOUISE JOHNSTON | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA TERESA JANE SMART | Trustee | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN GARY FARRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ANDREW LINDSAY MCPHERSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.