Trustees UNIVERSITY OF WESTMINSTER STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1148216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mariana Bernardes Ciolfi | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fuell | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Hazim Abdulhameed Almalallah | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Goldsmith | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Hassan Jaffar | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yashesh Tanna | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Divanshu Airan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nandini Aggarwal | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Taruna Bangia | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Connor Murray-Gauld | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
AFTAB AHMED | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.