Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST FRANCIS, MONKS HILL, SELSDON
Charity number: 1150124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PETER CHARLES WYATT | Chair | 09 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Waddell | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Beinomugisha | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Pearson | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Conde | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Canning | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joseph | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Waddell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jimmy Wavamunno | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gay Costello | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Thomas | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.