Trustees SMART WORKS (GREATER MANCHESTER)
Charity number: 1163594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elsa Gayle ZEKENG | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kay Truelove-Barratt | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Janette Iceton | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Lever | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Samantha Reed | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Martin | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Weighell | Trustee | 18 July 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.