Trustees THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR ASIAN AFFAIRS
Charity number: 1179300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Ibbotson | Chair | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Kerry Brown | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Lucy Mary Spink | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve King | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hayes | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ross McKee | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Kate Thorp | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Dorey | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Skipper | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN STEGER | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa EASLEA | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.