Trustees MASJID & IMAMBARGAH SHUHDAE KARBALA
Charity number: 1187832
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raja Amjad Nawaz | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tyeb Hussain | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
HAMZA ALI SHAH | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Mohammad Ali Shah | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SYED TANWEER HUSSAIN SHAH | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Syed Shah | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syed Ali Haider | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHAKIR SHAH | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SYED MUHAMMAD BAQIR NAQVI | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Syed Abrar Shah | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.