DRESDEN ASSISTANCE FUND IN CONNEXION WITH THE BROMPTON HOSPITAL FULHAM ROAD

Charity number: 1053584-7
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED WITH TWO CODICILS THERETO AT PR ON THE 2ND FEBRUARY 1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 17 NOVEMBER 1969 AND DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 13 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
(1) THE BENEFIT AND ASSISTANCE ON THEIR DISCHARGE OF NEEDY AND DESERVING IN-PATIENTS OF ANY HOSPITAL FROM TIME TO TIME COMPRISED IN THE GROUP OF HOSPITALS UNDER THE MANAGEMENT OF THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE HOSPITALS FOR DISEASES OF THE CHEST. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE YEARLY INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN MANNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR ASSISTING IN CASES OF NEED PATIENTS WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT AT ANY HOSPITAL IN THE SAID GROUP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 February 2002: Standard registration
  • 13 November 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 13 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1053584 ROYAL BROMPTON AND HAREFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITY
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of