CONEY HILL SCHOOL WILL TRUSTS

Charity number: 1116530-1
Linked charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 MAY 1962 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DTAED 2 JULY 1964, UNITING DIRECTION DATED 13 AUG 2004 (AS AMENDED BY UNITING DIRECTION UNDER S.96(5) CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 29 JUNE 2007)
Charitable objects
A HOME AND RESEARCH TREATMENT CENTRE AND SCHOOL FOR CRIPPLED CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 October 2007: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of