CHISWICK MISSION

Charity number: 1116530-3
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 9 MARCH 1891, AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29 SEPT 1918, UNITING DIRECTION DATED 13 AUG 2004. UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 29 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
FOR AN UNCONSECRATED MISSION HALL OR HOUSE FOR THE EXERCISE AND ADVANCEMENT OF PROTESTANT RELIGIOUS AND BENEVOLENT PURPOSES (AND NOT FOR ANY MEETING OF POLITICAL OR SOCIALISTIC OR TRADE UNION CHARACTER
Area of benefit
MIDDLESEX
Registration history
  • 11 October 2007: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of