REV FREDERICK VANE

Charity number: 208113-5
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 24 MAY 1957
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF NAVESTOCK
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 24 September 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 27 September 2012: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 22 June 2013: Re-registered
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of