THE LOG CABIN

Charity number: 275183
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 09 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
1.1.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1.1 TO PROVIDE EXCITING AND STIMULATING PLAY OPPORTUNITIES IN A SAFE, CARING AND FUN ENVIRONMENT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE AGED BETWEEN 4 AND 15 YEARS OLD LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING, WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS, DISABILITIES OR ARE IN NEED. IT AIMS TO MAKE A POSITIVE DIFFERENCE TO THE LIVES OF THE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES ATTENDING THROUGH: (A) PROVISION OF HIGH-QUALITY SERVICES, SUCH AS HOLIDAY PLAY SCHEMES, AN AFTER-SCHOOL CLUB, SCHOOL SESSIONS, SATURDAY CLUB, STAY-AND-PLAY SESSIONS AND COUNSELLING SESSIONS; (B) EMPOWERING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO MAKE INFORMED CHOICES AND TO GAIN A SENSE OF ACHIEVEMENT AND SELF-RESPECT; (C) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP SOCIALLY, PHYSICALLY, INTELLECTUALLY, CREATIVELY AND EMOTIONALLY; (D) DEVELOPING POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS WITH, AND WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH, PARENTS/CARERS, SCHOOLS, THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS; (E) ENSURING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO USE THE SERVICE AND FOR THE STAFF AND VOLUNTEERS; IMPROVING THE WELFARE OF FAMILIES WHO HAVE A CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON WITH SPECIAL NEEDS BY PROVIDING AFFORDABLE CHILDCARE AND SHORT BREAKS FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR PARENTS/CARERS
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 14 July 1978 : registered
  • 08 November 2018 : removed (AMALGAMATED)
Other names
  • THE LOG CABIN (Working name)
What the charity did
  • Disability
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services