FIND YOUR FEET LTD

Charity number: 290535-1
Linked charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MARCH 1960 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1972, 8 JUNE 1992 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY AMONGST INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE.
Registration history
  • 11 January 1967 : registered
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of