THE FLORENCE MICHAEL FUND

Charity number: 326730-1
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT DATED 11 DECEMBER 1931 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 10 MARCH 1989 AND 27 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER S74C OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 PASSED ON 22 JUNE 2011.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRUSTS FROM TIME TO TIME REGULATING THE CHARITY CALLED THE CHEST HEART AND STROKE ASSOCIATION (LEEDS) TRUST. [1. FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS LIVING IN THE LEEDS METROPOLITAN DISTRICT WHO ARE IN DISTRESS OCCASIONED BY CHEST AND HEART ILLNESSES 2. TO AID AND PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO RESPIRATORY DISEASE IN HOSPITALS AND UNIVERSITIES ANYWHERE IN THE UK. AND MAY APPLY THE BALANCE OF ANY INCOME IN THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE ASSOCIATION]
Area of benefit
UK
Registration history
  • 25 July 2002: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of