'COPPER WHEELS'

Charity number: 515726
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 15 MARCH 1984 AND 13 SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREA THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, OLD AGE, DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (BY WAY OF GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND THE LIKE) AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 09 November 1984 : registered
  • 17 May 2002 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available