AGECROFT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income from investments distributed to charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People
3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOSSEL TUNK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID TESCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BLIMA KAHANA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.46k | £7.94k | £11.23k | £4.60k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.28k | £9.23k | £9.49k | £4.08k | £7.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 326 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 326 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 August 2020 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 07 January 2020 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG MEMBERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Bergholt Crescent
London
N16 5JE
- Phone:
- 02088000117
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window