MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE (1990) TRUST

Charity number: 1143118-1
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 05/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS BY THE OPERATION OF A HELICOPTER EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICE WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS, SHROPSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, POWYS AND SUCH ADJACENT AREAS AS MAY BE EFFECTIVELY SERVED BY THE OPERATION OF ONE OR MORE HELICOPTER AMBULANCES
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 06 December 1990 : registered
  • 12 September 1997 : removed
  • 10 December 1997 : registered
Other names
  • COUNTY AIR AMBULANCE (Working name)
  • WMAAF (Working name)
  • MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY (Previous name)
  • WEST MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE FUND (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of