Trustees UNIVERSITIES UK
Charity number: 1001127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Iain Miles Macgregor Gillespie | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Jane Harrington | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KAREN MARGARET HOLFORD | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Nicholas Hugh Beech | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Right Honourable James Mark Dakin Purnell | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Gerry McCormac | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lisa Oriel Roberts | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Croney | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Cox | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nishan Canagarajah | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Malcolm Colin Press | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH TULIP TREASURE | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Steven West | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jennifer Mary Higham | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Adam Tickell | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shearer Carroll West | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rama Shankaran Thirunamachandran | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor SALLY LOUISE MAPSTONE | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Debra Humphris | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL JOSEPH BOYLE | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Quintin Archibald McKellar | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.