Trustees 10TH AIREDALE SCOUT GROUP CENTRAL YORKSHIRE
Charity number: 1001600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Sillitoe | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ann Day | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Peter Denison | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
GROUP SCOUT LEADER SUSAN WILKINSON | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Buxton | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Moss | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Renell Hewitt | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WRIGHT | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr IAN WOOD | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY ELLNER | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew ELlner | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.