THE LITTON READING ROOM AND WORKING MEN'S CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management committee maintains the village hall and organises the hiring to local groups and private parties and the village school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 February 1991: Standard registration
- LITTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Lambert | Chair | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Helena Willis | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ruth Whiteside | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gordon Fuller | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PREEDY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA OSCROFT | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN ARMITAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON RENNIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPHINE MARY ARMITAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FELICITY ANN RADFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MYRA ANN BARLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.02k | £8.49k | £6.85k | £796 | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.76k | £7.23k | £6.50k | £2.87k | £3.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF LITTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hammerton Hall Farm
Litton
BUXTON
SK17 8QP
- Phone:
- 01298872069
- Email:
- littonvhmc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window