Governing document THE CHINESE NATIONAL HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE
Charity number: 1002158
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 1989 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 29 SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 21 JANUARY 1991 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 23 JUNE 1998 AND 4TH OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHINESE PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNITED KINGDOM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.