Accounts and annual returns BRIDPORT CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1002844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window