CARDIGAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1003087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £539.02k £426.16k £708.39k £468.31k £379.34k
Total expenditure £578.28k £442.15k £670.92k £529.58k £374.99k
Income from government contracts £360.82k £81.75k £137.96k £196.76k N/A
Income from government grants £110.02k £41.89k £50.09k £36.21k £344.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £158 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £26.46k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £502.85k N/A £691.64k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £34 N/A £12 N/A N/A
Income - Other £9.51k N/A £16.74k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £578.28k N/A £670.92k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.00k N/A £8.15k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A