Accounts and annual returns BRITISH COMMUNITY FUND OF QATAR

Charity number: 1003334
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 143 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 143 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 May 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required