THE ST ERTH TRUST

Charity number: 1003363
Charity reporting is overdue by 959 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 594 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 594 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 959 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 959 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 20 March 2018 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 April 2017 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required