Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE WOKING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 DEC 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WOKING AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
WOKING
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.