WHALE AND DOLPHIN CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1014705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.54m £3.85m £5.13m £3.91m £4.26m
Total expenditure £3.73m £3.82m £3.96m £4.35m £4.09m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £34.97k £12.93k £27.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.40m £2.72m £3.99m £2.77m £3.28m
Income - Other trading activities £321.65k £336.66k £360.68k £351.63k £177.01k
Income - Charitable activities £815.62k £791.65k £777.58k £778.59k £789.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.58k £2.68k £4.43k £12.16k £15.52k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £557.28k £558.59k £650.18k £245.66k £428.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.81m £2.97m £2.96m £3.38m £3.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £920.50k £856.24k £999.91k £969.95k £820.72k
Expenditure - Governance £28.61k £34.40k £41.03k £40.67k £49.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0