NEWBRIDGE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising on behalf of Newbridge Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People
9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 19 October 1992: Standard registration
- NEWBRIDGE ST JOHNS INFANTS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Jane Whelan | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Nicola Derrien | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Purves | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Emma Pollard | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Robert Clews | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Kathy Runacres | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Brownell | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Ellen Osborn | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.22k | £36.21k | £22.05k | £33.70k | £38.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.05k | £35.94k | £11.41k | £21.81k | £48.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 July 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 July 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 1992 AND AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 25 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charmouth Road
BATH
BA1 3LL
- Phone:
- 01225421675
- Email:
- npsabath@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window