Accounts and annual returns KILLINGWORTH YOUNG PEOPLES CLUB

Charity number: 1015027
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Annual return 31 May 2020 26 May 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 26 May 2021 56 days late
Annual return 31 May 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Annual return 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Annual return 31 May 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 29 March 2018 On time