Accounts and annual returns CLASSICAL ROAD SHOW

Charity number: 1017635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window