Accounts and annual returns OXFORD PHAB CLUB

Charity number: 1021037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 July 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required