Trustees 10TH CHELTENHAM (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1021252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Claire Dermott | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Marie Austin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frank Say Thomas | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Harris | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Bailey | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Manning | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Maria Francoise Sullivan | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Anne MacKinnon | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARA LOUISE BOULTON | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.