Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST CATHERINES CHURCH

Charity number: 1023600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.32k £9.67k £8.29k £42.96k £47.40k
Total expenditure £36.61k £29.08k £13.80k £17.59k £8.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A