Accounts and annual returns STAPENHILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025180
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 June 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required