Accounts and annual returns PAPPLEWICK AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029178
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 November 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 August 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required