STROUD COURT COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1029448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time Download