FRIENDS OF BUNGAY HIGH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE REFRESHMENTS FOR PARENTS' EVENINGS and SCHOOL EVENTS AND PROVIDE FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
People
2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 April 1994: Standard registration
- BUNGAY HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSANNE RUSSELL | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angelo Goduti | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £395 | £210 | £876 | £56 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £287 | £228 | £494 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 645 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 645 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 13 January 2020 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2002, AS AMENDED 10TH NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WAVENEY VALLEY AND HALESWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUNGAY HIGH SCHOOL
QUEENS ROAD
BUNGAY
NR35 1RW
- Phone:
- 01986892140
- Email:
- mail@bungayhigh.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window