FOREST HOLME HOSPICE CHARITY

Charity number: 1038021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angie Smith Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
Dr Beverley Jayne Lee Trustee 22 November 2018 None on record
Stuart Bradford Trustee 10 July 2014 None on record
ROSEMARY LEWIS FCCA Trustee 20 October 2016
THE PURBECK SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
Karen Margaret Johnson Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record
Dr Stephen Richard Kirkham Chair 01 May 2013 None on record
James Robert Smith Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record