Accounts and annual returns ST EDWARD'S CATHOLIC JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038892
Charity reporting is overdue by 723 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 723 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 723 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 April 2021 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 April 2021 660 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required